Graham holdings board of directors
WebWallace R. Cooney. Senior Vice President–Finance Chief Financial Officer. Nicole M. Maddrey. Senior Vice President, General Counsel and Secretary. Jake Maas. Executive … WebMay 1, 2024 · Graham served as Chief Executive Officer of Nationwide Building Society, the UK's largest mutual institution and the world's largest building society from 2007 to 2016. Prior to that, he held a number of roles across the Nationwide organisation including Group Finance Director from 2003 to 2007. In a non-executive capacity, Graham has been a ...
Graham holdings board of directors
Did you know?
WebSep 10, 2024 · Graham Holdings Company Announces Stock Repurchase Authorization ARLINGTON, Va.--(BUSINESS WIRE)--Graham Holdings Company (NYSE: GHC) announced today that its Board of Directors has authorized the Company to acquire up to 500,000 shares of its Class B common stock. WebSep 15, 2024 · ARLINGTON, Va., September 15, 2024 -- ( BUSINESS WIRE )--Graham Holdings Company (NYSE: GHC) announced today that Danielle Conley has been elected to the Board of Directors. Ms. Conley recently ...
Web1 day ago · FILE - Martha Williams Director of the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, center, talks with Jimmy Laurent, regional energy coordinator for U.S. Fish and Wildlife, left, and … Web1 day ago · FILE - Martha Williams Director of the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, center, talks with Jimmy Laurent, regional energy coordinator for U.S. Fish and Wildlife, left, and Thomas Harris, Secretary ...
WebBoard of Directors Jonathan W. Painter James J. Barber, Ph.D. Cari L. Jaroslawsky Lisa M. Schnorr Troy A. Stoner Daniel J. Thoren WebOur board of directors includes some of the world’s most knowledgeable and successful leaders in business, automotive, technology and investing. Their expertise guides the future of mobility. Roxanne Bowman Operating Executive at NMS Capital Elaine L. Chao Former U.S. Secretary of Transportation and U.S. Secretary of Labor Bruce Chizen
WebJan 19, 2024 · ARLINGTON, Va. --(BUSINESS WIRE)--Mar. 23, 2024-- Graham Holdings Company (NYSE: GHC) announced today that Donald E. Graham has decided to transition from his role as Chairman of the Board of Directors. Mr. Graham will remain a member of the Board as Chairman Emeritus. Feb 24, 2024:
WebMar 23, 2024 · announced today that Donald E. Graham has decided to transition from his role as Chairman of the Board of Directors. Mr. Graham will remain a member of the Board as Chairman Emeritus.... grange cottages colworthWebApr 6, 2024 · As of April 6, 2024, the average one-year price target for Apollo Medical Holdings is $49.98. The forecasts range from a low of $38.38 to a high of $63.00. The average price target represents an ... chinese winter melon soup with meatballsWebPresident, Chief Executive Officer & Director, Graham Holdings Co. Timothy J. O'Shaughnessy founded LivingSocial, Inc. Presently, he is President, Chief Executive Officer & Director at... chinese wireless camerasWebBoard of Directors in Graham Holdings Co. For its 2024 fiscal year, Graham Holdings Co, listed the following board members on its annual proxy statement to the SEC. Name Total COMPENSATION; Anne M. Mulcahy: Total Cash $170,000: Christopher C. Davis: Total Cash $190,000: chinese winter olympics mascotWebG. Richard Wagoner. Retired Chairman of the Board and Chief Executive Officer, General Motors Corporation. Elected to the board June 10, 2010. G. Richard (“Rick”) Wagoner retired from General Motors Corporation in August 2009 after a 32-year career. He served as GM chairman and chief executive officer from May 2003 through March 2009 and ... grange corkWebMr. Brossman joined Burnham Holdings in 2008 as Vice President and General Counsel. He has held the position of CEO and Director since 2012. Effective April 27, 2024, Mr. Brossman will take on the additional role of Vice Chairman of the Company. chinese winter olympic athletesWebJan 19, 2024 · ATLANTA, GA (January 19, 2024) – Stacey Halota, Vice President, Information Security and Privacy at Graham Holdings, has been appointed to serve on … grange council offices omagh